+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Act 13-11
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 799
- Senate Calendar Number 592
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6345
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 570
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 356
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/20
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 475 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 9, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 127 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 123
- Absent: 27
+ − Sponsors (68)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor