+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Change of Reference to Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Housing
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Change of Reference, House to Committee on Housing
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Change of Reference to Housing
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor