+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/05
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor