+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act 15-11
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 788
- Senate Calendar Number 479
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6863
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 573
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 363
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
- Public Hearing 02/20
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 179
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 6, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 63 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6