+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 987
- Senate Calendar Number 604
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9396
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 468
- House Calendar Number 293
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor