+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/19
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor