+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 482
- File Number 774
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 04/03
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary