+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-189
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 646
- File Number 852
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7554
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 501
- House Calendar Number 318
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 555 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 22, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 238 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (31)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor