+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act 19-103
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 1020
- Senate Calendar Number 638
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 10196
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10177
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Education
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Education
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 277
- House Calendar Number 183
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/05
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor