+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 766
- House Calendar Number 499
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/15 5:00 PM
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 01/29
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Sponsor
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor