+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-23
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 703
- Senate Calendar Number 501
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6160
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 458
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 294
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 257 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 74 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 145
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (12)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor