+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act 15-241
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 649
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8722
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 259
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 401
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/25
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 469 PASS
- Yeas: 36
June 2, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 328 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor