+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-131
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 348
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 74
- File Number 76
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Insurance and Real Estate
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/05
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 469 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
April 10, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 35
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (29)
Select Committee on Aging
Type:
Primary Sponsor