+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-130
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 591
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 235
- File Number 356
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/20
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 474 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 9, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 135
- Yeas: 139
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (35)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor