+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 442
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 411
- House Calendar Number 312
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor