+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Sponsors (5)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor