+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-166
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 882
- Senate Calendar Number 680
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8203
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 720
- House Calendar Number 500
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 04/05
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 505 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 30, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 307 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (122)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor