+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce