+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 434
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 467
- House Calendar Number 334
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/26
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor