+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Act 16-15
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5558
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 596
- Rules Suspended
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- File Number 670
- House Calendar Number 423
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/16 5:00 PM
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/22
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 264 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
May 4, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 398
- Yeas: 36