+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-128
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 563
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 316
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 499
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/14
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 453 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 8, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 113
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (8)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor