+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 234
- House Calendar Number 195
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/21 5:00 PM
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banking
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/09
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banking
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor