+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act 16-70
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 756
- Senate Calendar Number 533
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5224
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- File Number 423
- House Calendar Number 288
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/14
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 3, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 323
- Yeas: 36
April 27, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 155 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 145
- Absent: 5