+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-68
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 466
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 457
- House Calendar Number 293
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/22
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 353 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 24, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 65
- Yeas: 145
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (14)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor