+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-234
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Rules Suspended
- Senate Calendar Number 598
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5496
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Education
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Education
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 636
- House Calendar Number 406
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/31
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 295 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 387 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (47)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor