+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-185
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 716
- Senate Calendar Number 527
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4510
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 635
- House Calendar Number 405
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/31
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 423 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 28, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 153 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (52)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor