+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 11, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act 17-207
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 599
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8658
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 213
- House Calendar Number 166
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/16
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 12, 2017: APP Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 4
March 9, 2017: LAB Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2017: LAB Vote Tally Sheet
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor