+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-184
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 748
- Senate Calendar Number 551
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4848
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 597
- House Calendar Number 389
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/24
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 429 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 213 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 142
- Absent: 9