+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 557
- File Number 747
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4811
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 304
- File Number 511
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/21
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 198 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (5)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor