+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 570
On May 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5225
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 303
- File Number 510
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/21
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
May 3, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 236 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 45
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (9)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor