+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-183
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 429
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 301
- File Number 508
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/21
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 400 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 16, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 62
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (5)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor