+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 707
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/28/14 5:00 PM
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 300
- File Number 507
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/21
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Sponsors (3)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor