+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
February 16, 2017: VA Vote Tally Sheet
January 26, 2017: VA Vote Tally Sheet
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor