+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 675
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/14 5:00 PM
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 222
- File Number 360
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (5)
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor