+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 442
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 508
- House Calendar Number 350
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/26
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
April 4, 2018: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor