+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 552
- House Calendar Number 363
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 5:00 PM
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/24
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor