+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-230
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5606
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 599
- Rules Suspended
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 452
- House Calendar Number 266
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 296 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 455 PASS
- Yeas: 36