+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 595
- House Calendar Number 396
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/23
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2018: PD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
April 3, 2018: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor