+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 510
- File Number 695
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4049
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 284
- File Number 476
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/19
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 24, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 110 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 137
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (16)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor