+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 344
- File Number 536
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsors (3)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor