+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 576
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5140
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 298
- File Number 505
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 5, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 252 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 142
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor