+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Act 14-23
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5557
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 589
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 535
- House Calendar Number 343
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 444 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 6, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 265 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 148
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (17)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor