+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-182
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 500
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 342
- File Number 534
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 417 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 24, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 103
- Yeas: 140
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (3)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor