+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 573
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5420
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 341
- File Number 533
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/19
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 5, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 246 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 122
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (26)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor