+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 83
- House Calendar Number 73
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor