+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Act 14-2
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 439
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 295
- File Number 502
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/21
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 239 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
April 17, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 70
- Yeas: 137
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor