+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 546
- House Calendar Number 342
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (11)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor