+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-179
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 452
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 189
- File Number 309
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 404 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 22, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 78
- Yeas: 142
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (13)
Public Safety and Security Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor