+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- File Number 410
- House Calendar Number 274
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/10
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate