+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-164
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 603
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 623
- House Calendar Number 412
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/13
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 494 PASS
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
May 14, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 150
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 10